Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the limit on the number of call centers that may be approved by 2-1-1 Maryland to provide certain services; repealing certain provisions of law establishing and governing the Health and Human Services Referral Board in the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department to conduct a cost analysis that includes a determination regarding the amount of funding needed to support certain 2-1-1 services and to report the findings to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0669
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {587978/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {587978/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 42A
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49B
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295
Text - Chapter - Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1201 through 24-1203, 24-1204, 24-1205, 24-1206 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:12 PM