Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2021)
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain agencies, to collect certain information each year; requiring the Department to establish and maintain a certain database on the Department's website; requiring the Department to publish on the Department's website a Student Horizon Scorecard by October 1, 2022, and each October 1 thereafter; requiring the Student Horizon Scorecard to include certain information and be distributed by local school systems to high school students by October 31 each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0046
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2021)
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
(   7-126 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page