Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland Act
Sponsored by
Senators King, Bates, Cassilly, Currie, Eckardt, Feldman, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Lee, Manno, Mathias, Nathan-Pulliam, Ready, Smith, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Office of Legislative Audits to perform an audit of local governments that receive a distribution of highway user revenues; increasing, over 7 fiscal years, the portion of highway user revenues that is distributed to local governments; altering the allocation of the local share of highway user revenues among Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities; requiring, if distributions to municipalities do not equal $26,400,000, that additional distributions of highway user revenues be made to specified municipalities; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1322
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland Act
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1220, 2-1223 )
(   1-101, 8-402, 8-403, 8-412 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM