Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain governmental units to produce and update certain accountability reports relating to the development, procurement, or use of facial recognition services at certain intervals through a certain process; prohibiting certain governmental units from using facial recognition services under certain circumstances and for certain purposes; requiring certain governmental units to disclose the use of facial recognition services to certain individuals in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-1701 through 10-1711 )
Last Updated: 2/28/2021 1:14 PM
Click to return on the top page