Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that in Washington County, if approved by the county governing body, a vehicle with a gross maximum weight not exceeding 95,000 pounds may use Warfordsburg Road from the Lanco-Pennland Dairy Cooperative cheese factory located at 14738 Warfordsburg Road to the Maryland-Pennsylvania border.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Text - Chapter - Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM