Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the contents of a certain report required by the Department of Human Services regarding children and foster youth in the State child welfare system; requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 1 each year, to report to the General Assembly and the Department of Human Services certain information regarding children and foster youth in the State child welfare system; requiring the State Department of Education to publish each report on its website within 30 days after submission to the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0258
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0662 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {338478/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {338478/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Child Welfare System - Reporting
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:08 AM
Click to return on the top page