Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to change the name of the Court of Appeals to be the Supreme Court of Maryland, to change the name of the Court of Special Appeals to be the Maryland Appellate Court, to change the name of a Judge of the Court of Appeals to be a Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland, and to change the name of the Chief Judge of the Court of Appeals to be the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of Maryland; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1329
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals - Renaming
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1, 10, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 22, 3, 3A, 41E, 4B, 5A )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM