Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Middle School Students - Awarding of Credit
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a county board of education to award credit to a middle school student for any course for which a high school student would be awarded credit if the middle school student meets the same requirements as the high school student.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {354634/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {354634/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 45
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 46
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-132 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM