Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Immigration Enforcement - County Boards of Education, Public Institutions of Higher Education, and Hospitals - Policies
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education, public institution of higher education, and hospital to establish a policy on or before July 1, 2020 that limits immigration enforcement on the premises to the fullest extent possible consistent with federal and State law based on certain guidelines established by the Attorney General; and requiring the Attorney General, in consultation with certain stakeholders, to develop certain guidelines on or before December 31, 2019.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1273
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Immigration Enforcement - County Boards of Education, Public Institutions of Higher Education, and Hospitals - Policies
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-126, 4-135 )
(   19-310.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM