Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools – Medical Cannabis – Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina’s Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Guzzone, Hayes, Jennings, Kramer, Lee, Reilly, Young, Hershey, and Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a parent or legal guardian of a medical cannabis patient under the age of 18 years to designate not more than two additional adults to be a caregiver, in addition to the parent or legal guardian; specifying that the definition of "caregiver" does not include designated school personnel; authorizing a qualified patient under the age of 18 years to obtain medical cannabis from certain designated school personnel; exempting certain caregivers and school personnel from certain penalties related to the administration of cannabis; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0617
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {614030/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-3)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Medical Cannabis - Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {614030/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Public and Nonpublic Schools – Medical Cannabis – Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina’s Law)
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means 51
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (127-3) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Text - Chapter - Public and Nonpublic Schools – Medical Cannabis – Policy for Administration During School Hours and Events (Connor and Raina’s Law)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-446 )
(   13-304, 13-3301, 13-3304, 13-3313 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:12 PM