Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Medical Cannabis - Guidelines for Administration to Students
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on or before December 1, 2020, the State Department of Education and the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission jointly to develop guidelines for public schools regarding the administration of medical cannabis to certain students during school hours and school-sponsored after-school activities; providing for the contents of the guidelines; requiring, on or before December 1, 2020, the Department and the Commission jointly to provide certain technical assistance to schools; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - Public Schools - Medical Cannabis - Guidelines for Administration to Students
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 10:01 AM