Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Gas Pipelines - Emergency Response Planning
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Emergency Management Agency (MEMA), in consultation with specified persons, to establish emergency response standards for specified gas transmission companies; requiring a gas transmission company to submit to MEMA an emergency response plan that meets specified minimum federal standards; requiring MEMA to review the emergency response plan of a gas transmission company and to require amendments or updates as needed to protect public safety; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1224
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101 through 15-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM