Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Kent County under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of Kent County's participation in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0456
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
18AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 18AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Appropriations 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262
Text - Chapter - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 11:50 AM
Click to return on the top page