Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund to be used to maintain and construct trails for off-highway recreational vehicles on certain land; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to administer the Fund; requiring the Comptroller to distribute 25% in fiscal year 2019, and 50% in fiscal year 2020 and each year thereafter, of the revenue from the excise tax imposed on certain certificates of title issued for certain off-highway recreational vehicles to the Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {559035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {440615/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {559035/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation Ways and Means 50
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {440615/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 700
Text - Chapter - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Excise Titling Tax - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Trail Fund
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-814, 3-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM