Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring membership in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System for certain local detention center officers of Kent County under certain circumstances; providing that a certain individual is entitled to eligibility service and creditable service that was earned before the effective date of Kent County's participation in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System; providing for the transfer of creditable service for a certain individual; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0456
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Favorable Adopted 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2021 2/15/2021 Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Kent County
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2021 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page