Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision
Sponsored by
Senators King, Carozza, Edwards, Elfreth, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Peters, Serafini, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a certain appropriation calculated under the Senator John A. Cade Funding Formula and a certain appropriation for Baltimore City Community College include appropriations, regardless of where they are budgeted, designated for the general operation of 4-year public institutions of higher education in the State.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Community Colleges - State Funding - Revision
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-305, 16-512 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:13 PM