Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-36)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy to study and review certain issues related to certain changes to forested lands in the State due to certain circumstances; requiring the Task Force to develop findings and recommendations regarding forest conservation in Maryland and to report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; authorizing the Task Force to consult with the Chesapeake Bay Program, the U.S. Forest Service, and certain governmental entities and academic institutions; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0766
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994034/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994034/1
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994034/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Committee Amendment Withdrawn
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {183425/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Bates) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {823624/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840312/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-36)
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Standards and Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {994034/1 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Young) Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {994034/1 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Young) Adopted 48B
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {994034/1 53
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 53
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) 53
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 53
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-29) 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {903729/1 (Senator Young) Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {183425/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Bates) Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Floor Amendment {823624/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected 54
Senate 3/27/2018 3/23/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Task Force on the Forest Conservation Act Offset Policy
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {840312/1 Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (103-36) 67
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM