Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Sponsored by
Senator Augustine
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the minimum age, from 16 years to 12 years, at which a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to consultation, diagnosis, and certain treatment of a mental or emotional disorder by a health care provider or clinic; and providing that a health care provider may decide to provide certain information to a certain parent, guardian, or custodian under certain provisions of law unless the health care provider believes that the disclosure will lead to harm to the minor or deter the minor from seeking care.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0782
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117279/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117279/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments (30-15)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {803126/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {117279/1 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments {117279/1 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments (30-15) 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Floor Amendment {803126/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) 49
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent (Mental Health Access Initiative)
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 50
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49B
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/4/2020 5:21 PM