Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Individual Income Tax - Rates and Rate Brackets - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the rates and rate brackets under the State income tax on certain income of individuals; requiring the Comptroller to waive certain interest and penalties for calendar year 2021 under certain circumstances; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Individual Income Tax - Rates and Rate Brackets - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Individual Income Tax - Rates and Rate Brackets - Alterations
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page