Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Payment of Wages
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing Frederick County to pay the wages of a county employee by debit card and to require an employee to elect to receive the payment of wages by debit card or by direct deposit as a condition of employment; and requiring the county, under specified circumstances, to provide specified employees with a specified statement.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0476
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
17A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737177/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 Reassigned to Finance 17A
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {737177/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 40
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM