Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a State contribution to a Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan may be made to one account for each qualified beneficiary; limiting, for State contribution application periods after December 31, 2020, a qualified beneficiary from receiving more than one State contribution for each year the beneficiary is eligible for the State contribution; and authorizing the Maryland 529 Board to adopt certain regulations.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0532
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 12:56 PM