Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of law concerning a credit against the State income tax for preservation and conservation easements to allow specified persons to claim the credit for an easement conveyed to the Maryland Environmental Trust, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, or the Department of Natural Resources for the purpose of preserving open space, natural resources, agriculture, forest land, watersheds, significant ecosystems, viewsheds or historic properties under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0002
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {509835/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {509835/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-723 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM