Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Conway, Pinsky, Bates, Nathan-Pulliam, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program at Baltimore City Community College, Bowie State University, Coppin State University, Morgan State University, and the University of Maryland Eastern Shore to train students in computer networking and cybersecurity; requiring the Governor, in fiscal year 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter, to include in the annual State operating budget an appropriation of $2,500,000 for the Maryland Higher Education Commission to provide grants to certain institutions in the State for the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1819
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {264135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584565/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Coppin State University and Morgan State University - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {264135/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {584565/1 Adopted 62
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Established
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1401 through 11-1406, 11-206 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM