Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Brinkley and Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners of Frederick County to issue a specified alcoholic beverages license to specified types of organizations located in the county; altering a specified restriction on the number of bottles of wine that may remain open at any one time at a wine sampling or tasting event in the county; prohibiting a single individual at an event from consuming more than a specified amount of wine from all brands in a single day; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0433
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273891/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 31
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 36
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {273891/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 8-211, 8-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM