Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Maintenance Organizations - Certificate of Need Requirements - Modification
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Feldman, Astle, Benson, Jennings, Hershey, Mathias, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain requirement that a health maintenance organization or a certain health care facility have a certificate of need before taking certain actions to establish a certain ambulatory surgical facility or center; altering the conditions under which a health maintenance organization or a certain health care facility is required to have a certificate of need before taking certain action to establish a health care project; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1282
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {237970/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {973125/2 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Maintenance Organizations - Certificate of Need Requirements - Modification
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments {237970/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Floor Amendment {973125/2 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Health Maintenance Organizations - Certificate of Need Requirements - Modification
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 449
Text - Chapter - Health Maintenance Organizations - Certificate of Need Requirements - Modification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM