Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Klausmeier, Lam, Lee, Washington, West, and Young
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "retail pet store" to include a broker that transfers dogs for resale by another person for purposes of certain provisions of law regulating retail pet stores; clarifying a certain prohibition on the sale of cats or dogs by retail pet stores; repealing a certain statement of intent of the General Assembly; and altering a certain definition.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {577470/2 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Internet Sales of Domestic Animals (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2020)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {577470/2 Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2020)
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Economic Matters 49
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/4/2020 5:21 PM