Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Establishment of Rent Escrow Accounts - Time Limit
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a tenant who receives a court order to pay rents into a certain escrow account to establish the escrow account on the day the order is entered; and requiring a certain order relating to a wrongful detainer action to require a certain amount to be paid on the day the order is entered.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Landlord and Tenant - Establishment of Rent Escrow Accounts - Time Limit
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page