Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zucker, and Zirkin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each local correctional facility and each correctional facility in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to have a policy in place regarding the medical care of pregnant inmates that addresses certain matters including access to child placement resources; requiring the managing official of each facility to provide the written policy to an inmate at the time of a positive pregnancy test; requiring the Maryland Commission on Correctional Standards to review each correctional facility's policy; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0787
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {478977/1
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {478977/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-7)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-15)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {478977/1 48B
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 48B
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Favorable with Amendments {478977/1 Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Third Reading Passed (37-7) 50
House 3/21/2018 3/17/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (122-15) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828
Text - Chapter - Correctional Facilities - Pregnant Inmates - Medical Care
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM