Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Augustine, Bailey, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Gallion, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Hester, Hettleman, Hough, Jennings, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Miller, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, Smith, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Efficient Grant Application Council to study and make recommendations to the Governor's Grants Office and the Board of Public Works regarding the entire life cycle of a grant and the creation of certain materials for use by certain grant-making agencies, grant applicants, and grant recipients; requiring the Board to adopt by regulation a uniform grant application form, uniform financial controls and reporting requirements, and uniform performance progress reporting requirements on or before July 1, 2021: etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1539
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {806984/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {806984/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {376681/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {704933/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 47B
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {806984/1 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {806984/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {376681/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Grant Applications and Reporting - Uniform Forms and Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:17 AM