Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a refillable container permit in Washington County; authorizing the Washington County Board of License Commissioners to issue a refillable container permit to the holders of specified licenses for specified fees and subject to specified requirements; specifying permit fees; specifying that the hours of sale for the permit begin at the same time as those for the license already held by the person to whom the refillable container permit is issued; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0835
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {403990/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2015 3/05/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 37
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 41
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {403990/1 Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-107, 8-103, 8-222.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM