Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a certain formula for the calculation of a certain child support obligation under the child support guidelines when a parent with shared physical custody keeps the child or children overnight a certain number of times in a year.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0731
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Text - Third - Child Support - Shared Physical Custody
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM