Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the salary of a Sheriff's deputy in Allegany County; and clarifying that at least one of the Sheriff's deputies is required to be assigned by the Sheriff to execute process, orders, and directions for the juvenile court and specified other duties as assigned by the Sheriff.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0858
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 39
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM