Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability in the Department of Legislative Services; requiring the Office to conduct certain performance evaluations of certain units of State government; renaming the Joint Audit Committee as the Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee with an expanded role in reviewing evaluations conducted by the Office; requiring the Office to conduct certain investigations under certain circumstances; altering the manner in which certain governmental units are evaluated; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1113
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m. (House Rules and Executive Nominations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (House Rules and Executive Nominations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {163226/1 Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/11/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Appropriations Rules and Executive Nominations 43A
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 3/22 at 12:00 p.m. (House Rules and Executive Nominations)
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (House Rules and Executive Nominations)
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Text - Chapter - State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-1206, 2-1230 through 2-1241, 2-1234 through 2-1241, 2-1243 through 2-1249, 2-1247, 2-1251, 2-1256, 2-601, 2-602, 2-605, 8-401, 8-402, 8-403, 8-404, 8-405 through 8-409, 8-408, 8-410, 8-411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM