Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing the holder of a micro-brewery license to apply for and obtain an additional micro-brewery license for another premises; specifying limitations on the distribution and sale of beer brewed by a holder of an additional micro-brewery license; providing that provisions of law that prohibit a holder of a micro-brewery license from owning, operating, or being affiliated with other manufacturers of beer, or being granted a wholesale alcoholic beverages license, do not apply in Allegany County or Frederick County; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0330
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {114238/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {114238/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-201, 2-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM