Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person in Allegany County from operating an all-terrain vehicle or snowmobile on controlled access highways; authorizing a local authority in Allegany County to authorize a person to cross a highway at a right angle on an all-terrain vehicle or snowmobile when operated at not more than 25 miles per hour; authorizing a local authority in Allegany County to authorize the operation of a snowmobile or an all-terrain vehicle on a certain portion of highway when operated at not more than 25 miles per hour; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0722
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 45
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - All-Terrain Vehicles and Snowmobiles
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-104.1, 25-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM