Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough's Cancer Protection Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Benson, Elfreth, Guzzone, Hayes, Hester, McCray, Peters, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which certain firefighters, fire fighting instructors, rescue squad members, advanced life support unit members, and sworn members of the Office of the State Fire Marshal are presumed to be suffering from an occupational disease that was suffered in the line of duty and is compensable under the workers' compensation law; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0604
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {207275/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {953421/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-4)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {207275/1 Adopted 51
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Floor Amendment {953421/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough's Cancer Protection Law)
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-4) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text - Chapter - Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough's Cancer Protection Law)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM