Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Peters, Ramirez, Robinson, Salling, Young, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the suspension or expulsion of prekindergarten, kindergarten, first grade, or second grade students from public schools with specified exceptions for an expulsion required by federal law or a suspension for not more than 5 school days under specified circumstances; requiring the principal or school administration to contact a student's parent or guardian under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484035/1
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484035/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {413522/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-46)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 47
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/21 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 47
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable with Amendments {484035/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {413522/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (18-28) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 49
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (92-46) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 843
Text - Chapter - Public Schools - Suspensions and Expulsions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-319, 7-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM