Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, on or before April 1, 2022, to develop and publish materials to assist State residents with long-term care family planning; requiring certain materials to meet certain requirements, be consistent with certain other materials, and include certain contact information; requiring the Department to make certain materials available in certain languages; and requiring certain State agencies to update certain websites in a certain manner on or before April 1, 2022.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0599
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2021
Legislative Date
1/31/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2021 1/31/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Long-Term Care Planning
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 4:45 PM
Click to return on the top page