Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll and Howard County Boards of Education – Establishing Innovative Regional Schools – Authority (Cross–County Attendance to Achieve Efficiency Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senators Hester and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the county boards of education of Carroll County and Howard County to establish innovative regional schools subject to certain requirements and approval; requiring a memorandum of understanding between the county boards to address the governance, operations, maintenance, and financing of innovative regional schools; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to study and develop a certain cost-share formula; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244033/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Washington) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244033/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {995964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Establishing Innovative Regional Schools - Authority (Cross-County Attendance to Achieve Efficiency Act of 2019)
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {244033/1 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Washington) Adopted 46
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {244033/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Establishing Innovative Regional Schools - Authority (Cross-County Attendance to Achieve Efficiency Act of 2019)
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {995964/1 Adopted 63
House 4/05/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Carroll and Howard County Boards of Education – Establishing Innovative Regional Schools – Authority (Cross–County Attendance to Achieve Efficiency Act of 2019)
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Text - Chapter - Carroll and Howard County Boards of Education – Establishing Innovative Regional Schools – Authority (Cross–County Attendance to Achieve Efficiency Act of 2019)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM