Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Zucker, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, King, McCray, Peters, Rosapepe, Salling, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipality to provide, by law, the minimum number of years, not to exceed 40 years, that an elderly individual must live in the same dwelling in order to be eligible for a certain statewide optional property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1339
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {479634/2 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {863521/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {479634/2 Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Floor Amendment {863521/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 38
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Ways and Means 40
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text - Chapter - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals - Eligibility
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM