Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll Expenses
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Cassilly, Edwards, Hershey, Klausmeier, Muse, Serafini, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for specified tolls paid through the use of the E-ZPass Maryland program; providing the subtraction modification does not apply unless the amount of qualified toll expenses incurred by the taxpayer during the taxable year equals or exceeds $300; requiring a taxpayer to submit specified documentation to qualify for the subtraction modification; defining specified terms; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0376 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM