Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Attorney General)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from being arrested or incarcerated for failure to respond to certain orders to appear in court relating to an examination in aid of enforcement of a money judgment entered in a small claim action in the District Court; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0848
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:19 PM
Click to return on the top page