Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retail Business Owners - Automated Teller Machines - Notice of Skimming Device
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the owner of a retail business with an automated teller machine located on the premises of the business who has knowledge of an illegal skimming device installed on or near the automated teller machine to immediately notify the operator of the automated teller machine of the existence of the skimming device and specified identifying information about the automated teller machine to assist the operator in identifying the affected automated teller machine.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {387576/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {387576/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM