Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Comptroller pay an annual grant from the Racing Special Fund to the Maryland Humanities Council; and requiring the Comptroller to pay a grant of $150,000 from the State Lottery Fund to the Maryland Humanities Council for Maryland History Day and other programming.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0937
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {779437/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134967/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {779437/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Referred Appropriations 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {134967/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Text - Chapter - State Lottery Fund - Maryland Humanities Council - Funding
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:27 PM
Click to return on the top page