Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensee
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the distribution of proceeds of video lottery terminals in Allegany County if the video lottery operation licensee owns or leases the video lottery terminals; increasing the distribution of proceeds of video lottery terminals from a facility in Allegany County to the licensee to be used for specified purposes; increasing the distribution of proceeds of video lottery terminals in Allegany County that are required to be used for local impact grants; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0811
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensee
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-1A-13, 9-1A-21, 9-1A-27 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page