Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Norman, Salling, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State or a local jurisdiction from imposing or levying a vehicle-miles-traveled tax or other similar fees, tolls, or taxes; prohibiting the State or a local jurisdiction from requiring the installation of a device in or on a privately owned vehicle to facilitate the reporting of vehicle-miles traveled; and providing for the application of specified provisions of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0454
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-205, 9-401 )
(   22-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM