Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Ready, and Serafini
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain law enforcement unit to sell, exchange, or transfer certain forfeited firearms to a federally licensed firearms dealer under certain circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1146
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0604 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {798979/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {798979/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM