Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to establish a certain process for certifying an individual who completes a police training program in another state or military police academy.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0649
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Acceptance of Out-of-State Training
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-207, 3-209 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:27 AM