Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the age that an individual under the age of majority must attain before the individual may marry under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0191
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0799 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938878/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {632219/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-34)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Gibson and Kittleman)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Gibson and Kittleman)
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {938878/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judiciary 50
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {632219/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (101-34) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Requests House Recede 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Smith, Hough and Lee) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Refuses Recede 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Gibson and Kittleman) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Sydnor, Gibson and Kittleman) 66
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM