Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senators Hough, Astle, Bates, Benson, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Muse, Norman, Peters, Ramirez, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain research facilities using dogs or cats for scientific research purposes to take certain steps to provide for the adoption of a certain dog or cat that is no longer needed for research purposes; authorizing certain research facilities to enter into collaborative agreements with animal rescue organizations for certain purposes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0732
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0420 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504634/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {273925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-26)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {504634/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Floor Amendment {273925/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-26) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Appropriations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text - Chapter - Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2018
(   15-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page